U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v.Warren
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Bond Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Temporary Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.