U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Withdraw Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [Grand Jury Transcripts]
  • April 03, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 03, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 03, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Bond Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2025: [Temporary Detention]
  • April 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • April 01, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.