U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: L:22-po-00378-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Pelicci
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Disposition/Judgment (Updates CVB)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Payment Received (Updates CVB)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 09, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance, Entry of Not Guilty Plea, Waiver, etc]
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Rights]
  • July 07, 2022: [- Non Public Document]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.