U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 15, 2022: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • June 15, 2022: [Preliminary Examination]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Bond Report]
  • June 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 10, 2022: [Withdraw Attorney]
  • June 10, 2022: [Temporary Detention]
  • June 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • June 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Complaint - No JS2]
  • June 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • June 10, 2022: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.