U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00235
  • Case Name: Friedman et al v. Ballard Spahr LLP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 13, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 26, 2021: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • May 25, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 25, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Brief]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Brief]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 08, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • February 05, 2021: [Reconsideration]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • December 16, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Joinder]
  • December 15, 2020: [Bankruptcy - Record on Appeal]
  • December 15, 2020: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.