U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00210
  • Case Name: Ridgeway v. General Motors LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • April 07, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Protective Order]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 23, 2020: [Payment Entry]
  • November 23, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 23, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2020: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2020: [Removal]
  • November 16, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 13, 2020: [Complaint]
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice of Removal (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.