U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-02006
  • Case Name: Ostler v. Peterson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • September 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Case]
July, 2019
  • July 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • July 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
June, 2019
  • June 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.