U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cr-00217-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pitt et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [CJA Voucher 20]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order for Compassionate Release re Section 603(b) of the First Step Act]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Response]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Filing Medical Records - Ex Parte]
  • April 14, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 13, 2022: [Extend]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extend]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Filing Medical Records - Ex Parte]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Compassionate Release re Section 603(b) of the First Step Act of 2018]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [CJA Voucher 20]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order for Compassionate Release]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2021: [Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Response]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2020: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 18, 2020: [Extend]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2020: [Compassionate Release re Section 603(b) of the First Step Act of 2018]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Letter(s)]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Letter(s)]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2016: [Transcript - SEALED]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Vacate (2255)]
  • August 05, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 24, 2016: [Vacate (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.