U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-mj-01201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Habib
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2018: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.