U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 14, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • April 23, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • April 23, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • April 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 05, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 03, 2021: [Proposed Order]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Proof Of Service By Publication]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • July 17, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • July 13, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 09, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • July 09, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 08, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2020: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • July 02, 2020: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 22, 2020: [Response To Motion]
  • June 17, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 16, 2020: [Suppress]
  • June 08, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • May 19, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2020: [Waiver Of Right To Be Present At Hearings On Motions Prior To Trial]
  • May 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2020: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • May 13, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 12, 2020: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • May 12, 2020: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.