U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tiffner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Petition]
  • April 17, 2025: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 16, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order (SEALED)]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 04, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • February 03, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • December 18, 2020: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 10, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 02, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 30, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 27, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Oral Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 09, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2019: [Mail Returned]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [Witness List]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Other Document]
  • May 31, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 28, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 28, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 28, 2019: [Detain]
  • May 28, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.