U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ward
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Objection To Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 20, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 20, 2019: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 19, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • May 22, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 21, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.