U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00274-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Powers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 13, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 13, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 31, 2019: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order]
  • February 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 26, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • February 26, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • February 26, 2019: [Witness List]
  • February 25, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 25, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • February 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • January 14, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Waiver Of Right To Be Present At Hearings On Motions Prior To Trial]
  • January 04, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2018: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • December 06, 2018: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2018: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order for Warrant]
  • November 20, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 20, 2018: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • November 20, 2018: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.