U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garretson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • March 24, 2020: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • February 19, 2020: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • February 18, 2020: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
  • February 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Judgment for Revocation]
  • March 27, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • January 14, 2019: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 27, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Detain]
  • December 21, 2018: [Paperless Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Transfer In - Probationer or Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.