U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00257-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Westfall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 20, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • September 20, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • August 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 09, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Leave To File Document]
  • July 31, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • May 08, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 07, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • May 07, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Terminating Counsel]
  • April 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2019: [Statement Of Visiting Attorney]
  • April 02, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • March 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2019: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • January 03, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Bond]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2018: [Arraignment Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order]
  • December 13, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 16, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.