U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00269-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Wash
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 21, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 19, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 16, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • August 12, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • August 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 01, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Proposed Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Objection To Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 15, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • April 02, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 09, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • December 18, 2018: [Pretrial]
  • December 17, 2018: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2018: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2018: [Arraignment Order]
  • December 14, 2018: [Waiver Of Interstate Agreement On Detainers]
  • December 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 04, 2018: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 14, 2018: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • November 14, 2018: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.