U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Godsey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Return of Exhibits]
  • March 20, 2017: [Revocation Judgment Returned]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2017: [Appearance Bond]
  • February 01, 2017: [Exhibit List ]
  • February 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.