U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00001-14
  • Case Name: USA v. Bartley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Recusal]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [Pro Se Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • October 14, 2022: [Letter/Request]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Letter/Request]
  • September 09, 2022: [Transcript Request]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Response]
  • July 15, 2022: [Letter/Request]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preparation of Transcript at government expense]
  • July 13, 2022: [Letter/Request]
  • July 13, 2022: [Preparation of Transcript at government expense]
  • July 12, 2022: [Letter/Request]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
May, 2022
  • May 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 06, 2022: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Seal Document]
  • February 08, 2022: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order of Destruction]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 07, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 07, 2021: [USCA 4th Circuit Memorandum]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2021: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • May 17, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [SEALED Supervised Release Violation Report]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2021: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 11, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • May 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 05, 2021: [Court Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • May 04, 2021: [SEALED Supervised Release Violation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [SEALED Supervised Release Violation Report]
  • April 05, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • March 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
  • March 09, 2021: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 17, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 11, 2020: [Response]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2020: [Pro Se Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 21, 2020: [Minute Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 07, 2020: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • July 06, 2020: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA]
  • July 06, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Generic]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Sentence]
  • June 22, 2020: [Modify Sentence]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Transfer Out Supervised Releasee/Probationer]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 07, 2019: [Opinion - Jones]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Transfer Out Supervised Releasee/Probationer]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 15, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Standing Order 2018-9 - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 11, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 05, 2018: [Reduce Sentence]
  • October 05, 2018: [Seal]
  • October 03, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Seal]
  • August 31, 2018: [Reduce Sentence]
  • August 23, 2018: [Response]
  • August 23, 2018: [Letter]
  • August 20, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Roseboro Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Judgment-Revocation of Probation]
  • April 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Mail Returned]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 30, 2017: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • November 28, 2017: [Roseboro Notice]
  • November 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2017: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 08, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2017: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • October 30, 2017: [Court Hearing]
  • October 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • October 30, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2017: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 23, 2017: [Detention]
  • October 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • October 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 20, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 06, 2017: [Financial Arrangements Made]
  • October 05, 2017: [Transcript Request]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order Prisoner Service (2255)]
  • September 07, 2017: [Transcript Request]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Vacate (2255)]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2017: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • March 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Response]
  • January 30, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • January 03, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Waiver of Hearing to Modify Conditions of Prob or SR]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Petition to Modify Conditions or Term of Supervision]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2016: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • November 10, 2016: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 09, 2016: [Downward Departure]
  • November 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - Amendment 782]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - Amendment 782]
  • October 28, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - Amendment 782]
  • October 07, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 03, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 03, 2016: [USCA Order]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order for Bond Forfeiture]
  • September 29, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • September 29, 2016: [Exhibit List ]
  • September 29, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 27, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 12, 2016: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel in 4CCA]
  • September 12, 2016: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment to 4CCA]
  • September 02, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 02, 2016: [Sentencing]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons]
  • August 31, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 30, 2016: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 29, 2016: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Additional Evidence]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 28, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 24, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 23, 2016: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 22, 2016: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 19, 2016: [Waiver of Interstate Agreement on Detainers]
  • August 19, 2016: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 16, 2016: [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Appointment of Expert]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 09, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • July 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 22, 2016: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 06, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • June 06, 2016: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • June 02, 2016: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • May 20, 2016: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • May 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 03, 2016: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • April 18, 2016: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 07, 2016: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 06, 2016: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • April 06, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2016: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • April 01, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 01, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2016: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • March 31, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 29, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • March 29, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 10, 2016: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2016: [Court Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 07, 2016: [Discovery]
  • March 07, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • March 07, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Severing Defendant from Codefendant(s)]
  • March 03, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 01, 2016: [Jones Pretrial Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 26, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 22, 2016: [Bond]
  • February 21, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 12, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • February 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 09, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 09, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • February 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 05, 2016: [Transcript]
  • February 04, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • February 03, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 03, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 01, 2016: [Discovery]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 29, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 29, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 27, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 27, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 27, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Release of Jencks]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 26, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • January 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2016: [CJA 24 Authorization Completed]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 15, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 15, 2016: [Early Release of Jencks]
  • January 15, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 15, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 15, 2016: [Appearance Bond]
  • January 15, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • January 12, 2016: [Disclosure]
  • January 12, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 12, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 12, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.