U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Canty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 30, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • March 17, 2021: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • March 17, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • March 17, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [SEALED Supervised Release Violation Report]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • February 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • January 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order Transferring Case to Another Judge]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Letter]
  • January 08, 2016: [Request for Copies]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.