U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fisher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order Transferring Case to Another Judge]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • December 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order to Respond - First Step Act]
  • June 24, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • June 24, 2020: [Standing Order 2019-1 - Sec 404 First Step Act of 2018 - Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2020: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2016: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • January 13, 2016: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • January 13, 2016: [Factual Basis]
  • January 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order of Detention Pending Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 06, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 06, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.