U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:91-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaForce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • January 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order Finding Defendant Competent]
  • November 18, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 18, 2019: [Competency Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Psychiatric Report]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order Committing Defendant for Psychiatric Evaluation]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [Medical Exam]
  • April 22, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • April 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • April 22, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • February 10, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order of Detention Pending Sentencing]
  • December 29, 2015: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 29, 2015: [Detention]
  • December 29, 2015: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 29, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • December 29, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 29, 2015: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.