U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2021: [Waiver of Hearing to Modify Conditions of Prob or SR]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Document]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 29, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 10, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 30, 2019: [Reduce Sentence]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 13, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.