U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lunsford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [SEALED Supplemental Documents to Supervised Release Violation Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [SEALED Supervised Release Violation Report]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Upward Departure]
  • May 18, 2022: [Upward Departure]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 17, 2022: [SEALED Supervised Release Violation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • March 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • March 15, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 02, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Waiver of Hearing to Modify Conditions of Prob or SR]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Petition to Modify Conditions or Term of Supervision]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • August 17, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • August 17, 2017: [Alter Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 24, 2017: [Opinion - Jones]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Roseboro Notice]
  • June 21, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 20, 2016: [Dismiss]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order Prisoner Service (2255)]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender Pursuant to Standing Order 2015-5]
  • April 11, 2016: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 11, 2016: [Vacate (2255)]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.