U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:15-cr-00045-2
  • Case Name: USA v Irvin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address (2255)]
  • June 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2021: [Response]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order Transferring Case to Another Judge]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • January 15, 2021: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • January 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Response]
  • December 03, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 03, 2020: [USCA Order]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 25, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • November 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [SEALED Supervised Release Violation Report]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 05, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • September 25, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • September 25, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • September 15, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • September 09, 2020: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 08, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice of Appeal to 4CCA - First Step Act]
  • September 03, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 31, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • July 17, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • July 17, 2020: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 15, 2020: [Seal]
  • July 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 08, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 07, 2020: [Seal]
  • July 07, 2020: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order to Respond - First Step Act]
  • July 06, 2020: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • July 01, 2020: [Court Hearing]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Petition to Modify Conditions or Term of Supervision]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order to Amend/Correct]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • May 22, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 22, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 28, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 17, 2020: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 13, 2020: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • March 13, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 12, 2020: [Standing Order 2019-1 - Sec 404 First Step Act of 2018 - Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • March 12, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 05, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • March 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 05, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address (2255)]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 26, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • February 26, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Court Ordered Transcript - Official Court Reporter]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 18, 2020: [Appearance Bond]
  • February 18, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 18, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • February 13, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 13, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 31, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 31, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 31, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 30, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 30, 2020: [Arrest]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Warrant]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 23, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • December 23, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 29, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • September 10, 2019: [Minute Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2019: [Disclosure]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 06, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 06, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 27, 2019: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 29, 2019: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • July 24, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • July 24, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • May 14, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • May 14, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • May 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • May 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 13, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • May 08, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 08, 2019: [Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Waiver of Hearing to Modify Conditions of Prob or SR]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Petition to Modify Conditions or Term of Supervision]
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 08, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 08, 2019: [Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • January 23, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • January 16, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 16, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 14, 2019: [Court Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 14, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • January 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • January 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Standing Order 2018-9 - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 02, 2018: [Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Roseboro Notice]
  • July 30, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 13, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Waiver of Attorney Client Privilege]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Waiver of Attorney Client Privilege]
  • June 18, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 13, 2018: [Response]
  • June 13, 2018: [Letter]
  • June 08, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 04, 2018: [Transcript Request]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order Prisoner Service (2255)]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Response]
  • February 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 16, 2018: [Response]
  • February 15, 2018: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • February 15, 2018: [Response]
  • February 14, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 08, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notification of Transcript Fees]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Response]
  • January 31, 2018: [Request for Copies]
  • January 31, 2018: [Transcript Request]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address (2255)]
  • January 08, 2018: [Prisoner Document - Post Judgment]
  • January 08, 2018: [Additional Evidence]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 02, 2018: [Response]
  • January 02, 2018: [Request for Copies]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 22, 2017: [Response]
  • December 20, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • December 12, 2017: [Vacate (2255)]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order Transferring Case to Another Judge]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preparation of Transcript at government expense]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 20, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 20, 2017: [Vacate (2255)]
  • November 20, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • November 20, 2017: [Preparation of Transcript at government expense]
  • November 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • November 16, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 15, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 07, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 07, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • October 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Petition for Issuance of Summons-Revocation]
  • October 23, 2017: [Waiver of Hearing to Modify Conditions of Prob or SR]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Petition to Modify Conditions or Term of Supervision]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Substantial Assistance]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • March 09, 2017: [Roseboro Notice]
  • March 08, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 07, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • March 07, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 06, 2017: [Letter]
  • March 06, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 03, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order for Substantial Assistance]
  • March 01, 2017: [Post Sentence Report]
  • March 01, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order to Respond]
  • February 27, 2017: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • February 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order to Respond]
  • February 22, 2017: [Substantial Assistance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Substantial Assistance]
  • February 15, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 01, 2017: [In Limine]
  • February 01, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Order Prisoner Service (2255)]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • January 05, 2017: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • December 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 12, 2016: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 02, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2016: [Transcript Copy Delivered]
  • November 22, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 08, 2016: [Response]
  • November 02, 2016: [Financial Arrangements Made]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Transcript Request]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order Prisoner Condfil (2255)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Vacate (2255)]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • October 15, 2016: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • October 14, 2016: [Reduce Sentence]
  • October 13, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 11, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 11, 2016: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • October 08, 2016: [Order]
  • October 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • October 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • October 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 08, 2016: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • October 08, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 08, 2016: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing on Motion]
  • September 16, 2016: [Letter]
  • September 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order to Respond]
  • August 03, 2016: [Joint Order Filed]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 14, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2016: [Joint Order Filed]
  • July 13, 2016: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • July 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 30, 2016: [Suppress]
  • June 30, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • June 20, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 17, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2016: [Suppress]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Suppress]
  • May 31, 2016: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • May 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • May 20, 2016: [Disclosure]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • April 25, 2016: [Bond]
  • April 11, 2016: [Letter]
  • April 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2016: [Suppress]
  • March 29, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2016: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • February 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Stay]
January, 2016
  • January 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 30, 2016: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order of Competency to Stand Trial]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 27, 2016: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • January 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2016: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 04, 2016: [Stay]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 23, 2015: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • December 23, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • December 23, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.