U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:15-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chem-Solv, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [Factual Basis]
  • December 23, 2015: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • December 23, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 23, 2015: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • December 23, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 23, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 23, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.