U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10325
  • Case Name: Laura J Giles
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
January, 2019
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
December, 2018
  • December 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Dismiss Case]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Document]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 7)]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing Not Held]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Schedule H]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Schedule C]
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Application)]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing Held]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Deficiency Notice]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [All Schedules and Statements]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing (Document)]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Deficiencies (7)]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Application to Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.