U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10314
  • Case Name: Karen Frieden
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 7)]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Closed]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Continued]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.