U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10267
  • Case Name: Amanda Gardner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing Not Held]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • September 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Application)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.