U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10261
  • Case Name: Frances Annette Rawden
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
October, 2018
  • October 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice of Motion Under Default Procedure]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Avoid Lien]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Withdrawal]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing To Stay On]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Avoid Lien]
June, 2018
  • June 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.