U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10257
  • Case Name: John Markle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Trustee Fees]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Final Decree]
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • May 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [1-Discharging Debtor]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order Appr Fnl Rpt and Acct]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Approving Final Report & Account]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Statement of Intent]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [341 Mtg Closed]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order on Case Conversion]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Regarding Conversion of Case to Chapter 7]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [none]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Notice of Voluntary Conversion Ch 13 to 7]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion Ch 13 to 7]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approval of Mortgage Modification (Order)]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Motion Under Default Procedure]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Stricken]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approval of Mortgage Modification]
November, 2019
  • November 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
July, 2019
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Exhibit]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Avoid Lien]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Avoid Lien]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Status Report]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Employ (Application)]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Employ (Application)]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Scheduling Order Re Confirmation]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Operating Report]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Document)]
November, 2018
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Mortgage Mediation (Order)]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Mortgage Mediation]
September, 2018
  • September 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Determine Value of Collateral]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Determine Value of Collateral]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.