U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10256
  • Case Name: Robert H Clark, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Trustee Fees]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Final Decree]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [1-Discharging Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Reaffirmation Agreement Effective]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order Appr Fnl Rpt and Acct]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Approving Final Report & Account]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [341 Mtg Closed]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Digital Audio Recording]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order on Case Conversion]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Converting Case to Chapter 7]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Notice of Voluntary Conversion Ch 12 to 7]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Convert Case 12 to 7 (fee)]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order on Relief from Stay]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Document)]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay (fee) (including Stipulated Motions for Relief from Stay)]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 12 Plan]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Opposition]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 12 Plan]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Set/Reset/Satisfy Plan, WW Authorization or Disclosure Statement DDL(s)]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.