U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10248
  • Case Name: Matthew Craig Kimball and Danica Alexandra Zirkle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
October, 2018
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Vacate Discharge]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Proposed Order]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Vacate Discharge]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 7)]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement Effective]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.