U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10242
  • Case Name: Harriette Hamilton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Appr Fnl Rpt and Acct]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approving Final Report & Account]
  • September 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • September 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [1-Discharging Debtor]
  • September 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Findings Prior to Discharge in 12/13]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Entry of Discharge]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Completion of Plan Payments]
September, 2018
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.