U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10240
  • Case Name: Wanda Gail Poor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
July, 2018
  • July 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Appr Fnl Rpt and Acct]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approving Final Report & Account]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Dismissing Case (BK Only)]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Schedule D]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.