U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10235
  • Case Name: Richard F. Downing and Tracy D. Downing
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Trustee Fees]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Final Decree]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [1-Discharging Debtor]
July, 2018
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
June, 2018
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Deficiencies (7)]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [none]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.