U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10233
  • Case Name: Lynn M. Martin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Closed]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Continued]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Continued - Db Appeared]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
June, 2018
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.