U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10220
  • Case Name: Joseph John Tornabene, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
July, 2019
  • July 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Appr Fnl Rpt and Acct]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approving Final Report & Account]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
February, 2019
  • February 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Dismiss Case]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Dismiss Case]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order on Relief from Stay]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
December, 2018
  • December 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Motion Under Default Procedure]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay (fee) (including Stipulated Motions for Relief from Stay)]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Scheduling Order Re Confirmation]
November, 2018
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Post-Petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order on Relief from Stay]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Add Mediator]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice Re Selection of Mediator]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Adequate Protection]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Supplement]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Court Notice]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice (Generic)]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Mortgage Mediation (Order)]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 13)]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Mortgage Mediation]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Document)]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Motion Under Default Procedure]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Reply]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Payment Changes]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay (fee) (including Stipulated Motions for Relief from Stay)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
June, 2018
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • May 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.