U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10218
  • Case Name: Sharon Ann Godrick
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Appr Fnl Rpt and Acct]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approving Final Report & Account]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Dismiss Case]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Supplement]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approval of Mortgage Modification]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Stipulation (Not to be used for Stipulated Motion)]
November, 2018
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 13)]
August, 2018
  • August 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Claim]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Claim]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • May 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.