U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10215
  • Case Name: Alice L. Steere
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
January, 2022
  • January 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice (Generic)]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • August 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order on Relief from Stay]
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
  • July 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • July 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay (fee) (including Stipulated Motions for Relief from Stay)]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Status Report]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee Fees]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Amended Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order on Appl for Comp]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Compensation (Application)]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Compensation (Application)]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Form 22 - Statement of Current Monthly Income]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Amended Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order on Motion to Convert Case]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors (Amended)]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Convert Case 7/11 to 13]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [341 Mtg Continued]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Certificate of Service]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Convert Case 7/11 to 13]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Notice to File Claims]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Employ (Application)]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Consent]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Employ (Application)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Notice to File Claims]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Notice of Assets (no image needed)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [341 Mtg Continued - Db Appeared]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Withdrawal]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [none]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.