U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10212
  • Case Name: Kerry L. Bettis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Trustee Fees]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Final Decree]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [1-Discharging Debtor]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Reaffirmation Agreement Effective]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
May, 2018
  • May 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [none]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Obuchowski,, Chapter 7 Trustee Raymond J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.