U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10207
  • Case Name: Rodney A. Burns and Jennifer L Burns
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Payment Changes]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/ACH/TFS Authorization]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
  • December 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/ACH/TFS Authorization]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
November, 2019
  • November 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • October 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Supplement]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
September, 2018
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 13)]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Strip Wholly Unsecured Lien]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Document)]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Letter]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Letter]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Strip Wholly Unsecured Lien]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • May 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • May 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [All Schedules and Statements]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.