U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10205
  • Case Name: Scott Michael LaFountain
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amend]
  • August 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amend (Motion to)]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Stricken]
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay (fee) (including Stipulated Motions for Relief from Stay)]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Withdrawal]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approval of Mortgage Modification (Order)]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approval of Mortgage Modification]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Document)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Status)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 13)]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Determine Value of Collateral]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Ch 13 Tr Wages Pursuant to Wage Withholding Authorization]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Not Held]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Wage Withholding/Automatic Debits from Bank Account Authorization]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Response]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • May 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • May 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • May 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Ntc of Motion to Value Collateral]
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Mortgage Mediation]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Determine Value of Collateral]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.