U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10204
  • Case Name: Crystal M Comolli
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Case Reassigned]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • September 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order on Relief from Stay]
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Post-Petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
  • March 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay (fee) (including Stipulated Motions for Relief from Stay)]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Schedules/Amended Master Mailing List]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Relief from Stay (fee) (including Stipulated Motions for Relief from Stay)]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Transfer of Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2019
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approval of Mortgage Modification (Order)]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Modify Plan]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Notice of Delinquency]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Approval of Mortgage Modification]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Exhibit]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order Confirming Plan]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Add Mediator]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice Re Selection of Mediator]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Proposed Findings and Order Confirming 13 Plan]
  • September 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Document)]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 13)]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Digital Audio Recording]
July, 2018
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Closed]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Determine Value of Collateral]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing Held]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Trustee's Preliminary Report]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Document)]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing To Stay On]
  • July 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Court Notice]
  • July 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice (Generic)]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Mortgage Mediation (Order)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Mortgage Mediation]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Ntc of Motion to Value Collateral]
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Confirmation Hearing]
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - 13 Plan]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Determine Value of Collateral]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Hearing (Confirmation)]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Waive Wage Withholding]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Consent]
  • May 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Order]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Extend Time]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Waive Wage Withholding]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless)]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Deficiencies (13)]
  • May 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [none]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sensenich, Jan M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.