U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10194
  • Case Name: Mark E. Montalban
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Continued - Db Appeared]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Ntc Re Debtor Education Course Completion]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 7)]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing Not Held]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Continued]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [All Schedules and Statements]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Deficiencies (7)]
  • May 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
  • May 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Application)]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Payment of Chapter 7 Installment Fee]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Payment of Chapter 7 Installment Fee]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.