U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-00250
  • Case Name: Tuttle v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order Reversing the Decision of the Commissioner]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order Affirming the Decision of the Commissioner]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Affirming the Decision of the Commissioner]
August, 2018
  • August 18, 2018: [Reversing the Decision of the Commissioner]
  • August 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Administrative Record in Social Security Case]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 04, 2018: [Acknowledgment/Acceptance of Service (Summons and Complaint)]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.