U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00146
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Langley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Confirmation of Judicial Sale]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Confirmation of Judicial Sale (Govt Use Only)]
  • December 15, 2016: [Non-Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Judgment Order, Decree of Foreclosure and Order for Judicial Sale]
  • October 27, 2016: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 27, 2016: [Accounting]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Entry of Default by Clerk]
  • September 08, 2016: [Application for Clerk's Entry of Default]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2016: [Waiver of Service Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.