U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00256
  • Case Name: Beaupre v. O'Connor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order Reopening Case]
  • April 08, 2020: [Stipulation]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 25, 2020: [Report of Early Neutral Evaluator]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [ENE Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Evaluator Assigned]
  • December 23, 2019: [ENE By Stipulation re: Evaluator Selection]
  • December 06, 2019: [Potential Evaluators Letter Sent]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Early Neutral Evaluation]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 16, 2018: [Discovery Certificate - Interrogatories and Request to Produce]
  • December 14, 2018: [Discovery Certificate - Interrogatories and Request to Produce]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Discovery Certificate - Initial Disclosures]
  • November 08, 2018: [Stipulated Discovery Schedule / Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 05, 2018: [Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order (Proposed)]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Stipulated Discovery Letter Sent]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Sur-Reply to Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 06, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 06, 2018: [Sur-Reply to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • May 14, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2018: [Reconsideration]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 12, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Response in Support of Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [~Util - Case Reopened]
  • June 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Reconsideration]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Stipulated Discovery Letter Sent]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Stipulated Discovery Letter Sent]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2014
  • November 30, 2014: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.