U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-00250
  • Case Name: Siegal v. Tumi, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 06, 2015: [Withdraw]
  • August 03, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 03, 2015: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 27, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • July 27, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 16, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2014
  • November 18, 2014: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.