U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00287
  • Case Name: Jeanpierre v. Public Storage et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave to File Sealed Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.