U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Espinoza-Robles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • April 15, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 15, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.